THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:19:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Forest Hill Family Health Centre
Suite 200
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 782-6111
Fax: (416) 782-5515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Y. Baratz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Goldberg (CPSO#: 80727 ) Dr. A. Baratz (CPSO#: 76552 )
Business Address: Create Fertility Centre
1100 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(413) 323-7727

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Forest Hill Family Health Centre
Suite 200
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 782-6111
Fax: (416) 782-5515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Y. Baratz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Goldberg (CPSO#: 80727 ) Dr. A. Baratz (CPSO#: 76552 )
Business Address: Create Fertility Centre
1100 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(413) 323-7727

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ORLI DAWN GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ORLI DAWN GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004