THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 20:53:24 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room F-304
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-6024
Fax: (905) 540-6568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 06 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Shea and Verhovsek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. O'Shea (CPSO#: 77606 ) Dr. M. Verhovsek (CPSO#: 80732 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Address: Room F304
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-6024
Business Address: Juravinski Hopsital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42471

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room F-304
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-6024
Fax: (905) 540-6568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 06 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Shea and Verhovsek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. O'Shea (CPSO#: 77606 ) Dr. M. Verhovsek (CPSO#: 80732 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Address: Room F304
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-6024
Business Address: Juravinski Hopsital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42471

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADELEINE MARY VERHOVSEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERHOVSEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADELEINE MARY VERHOVSEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERHOVSEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004