THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:55:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room M1 700
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Address: 303 - 1065 Canadian Pl
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 625-5600
Fax: (905) 625-5650
Address: RK Schachter Dermatology Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street- 5th floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Alhusayen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Alhusayen (CPSO#: 80735 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Dermatology
Room M1 700
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: 303 - 1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
(905) 625-5600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room M1 700
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Address: 303 - 1065 Canadian Pl
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 625-5600
Fax: (905) 625-5650
Address: RK Schachter Dermatology Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street- 5th floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Alhusayen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Alhusayen (CPSO#: 80735 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Dermatology
Room M1 700
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: 303 - 1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
(905) 625-5600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RA'ED OMAR S ALHUSAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHUSAYEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RA'ED OMAR S ALHUSAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHUSAYEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2004