THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:56:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Cambridge Centre for Health
and Wellness
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Bouelvard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 624-5999
Fax: 519-624-1117

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tonya Ballard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ballard (CPSO#: 80749 )
Business Address: The Cambridge Centre for Health & Wellness
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 624-5999
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 752-7871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Cambridge Centre for Health
and Wellness
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Bouelvard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 624-5999
Fax: 519-624-1117

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tonya Ballard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ballard (CPSO#: 80749 )
Business Address: The Cambridge Centre for Health & Wellness
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 624-5999
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 752-7871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TONYA GALE BALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TONYA GALE BALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004