THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:44:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Prince Edward Medical
Unit 2
324 Prince Edward Drive South
Toronto Ontario M8Y 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 345-3048
Fax: (647) 777-6152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Sandy Tecimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tecimer (CPSO#: 80751 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Prince Edward Medical
Unit 2
324 Prince Edward Drive South
Toronto Ontario M8Y 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 345-3048
Fax: (647) 777-6152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Sandy Tecimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tecimer (CPSO#: 80751 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDY NEBIHE TECIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TECIMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDY NEBIHE TECIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TECIMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004