THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:07:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 49454
Fax: 289-398-1067
Address: 264 Welland Ave
Out and About Clinic/Rapid Access Addiction Medicine Clinic
St. Catharines ON L2R 2P8
Phone: 289-479-5090
Fax: 905-984-8574

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maithili Shetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shetty (CPSO#: 80757 )
Business Address: Mental Health and Addictions
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 49454
Fax: 289-398-1067
Address: 264 Welland Ave
Out and About Clinic/Rapid Access Addiction Medicine Clinic
St. Catharines ON L2R 2P8
Phone: 289-479-5090
Fax: 905-984-8574

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maithili Shetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shetty (CPSO#: 80757 )
Business Address: Mental Health and Addictions
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAITHILI RATHNAKAR SHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAITHILI RATHNAKAR SHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2019
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004