THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:21:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite E
530 Fred St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 239-2165
Fax: (613) 239-2167

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Davey MPC
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davey (CPSO#: 80770 )
Business Address: 530E Fred St 6132392165 Extn: 201

Corporation Name: Michelle Davey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite E
530 Fred St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 239-2165
Fax: (613) 239-2167

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Davey MPC
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davey (CPSO#: 80770 )
Business Address: 530E Fred St 6132392165 Extn: 201

Corporation Name: Michelle Davey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANNE LABELLE DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANNE LABELLE DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004