THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carleton Sport Medicine Clinic
The Ice House
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taryn Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Taylor (CPSO#: 80775 )
Business Address: Carleton Sport Medicine Clinic
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
(613) 520-3510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carleton Sport Medicine Clinic
The Ice House
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taryn Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Taylor (CPSO#: 80775 )
Business Address: Carleton Sport Medicine Clinic
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
(613) 520-3510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARYN-LISE TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARYN-LISE TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004