THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:37:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 257 Front Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7862
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Lindsay Street South
Lindsay Ontario K9V 2L8
Phone: (705) 324-5553
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 49 Chambers Street
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2Y3
Phone: (613) 283-0359
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9917 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8R 1A5
Phone: 5197356500
Fax: 5197356507
Address: 1101 University Ave W
Windsor ON N9A 5T1
Phone: 5192520991
Fax: 5192529821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patterson (CPSO#: 80778 )
Business Address: 9917 Tecumseh Rd E
OATC Windsor East
Windsor ON N8R 1A5
(519) 735-6500
Business Address: 1101 University Ave W
OATC Windsor
Windsor ON N9A 5T1
(519) 252-0991
Business Address: 563 Highland Ave
Home Office
Ottawa ON K2A 2J9
6134025742
Business Address: 257 Front Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2Z6
(613) 969-7862
Business Address: Suite 45
49 Chambers Street East
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2Y3
(613) 283-0359
Business Address: 40 Lindsay Street Souh
Lindsay Ontario K9V 2L8
(705) 324-5553
Business Address: 425 Wharncliffe Rd S
London ON N6J 2M6
519-204-8430
Business Address: 7 Hickson Ave
Kingston ON K7K 2N4
Business Address: 1-275 First St
Collingwood ON L9Y 1A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 257 Front Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7862
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Lindsay Street South
Lindsay Ontario K9V 2L8
Phone: (705) 324-5553
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 49 Chambers Street
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2Y3
Phone: (613) 283-0359
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9917 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8R 1A5
Phone: 5197356500
Fax: 5197356507
Address: 1101 University Ave W
Windsor ON N9A 5T1
Phone: 5192520991
Fax: 5192529821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patterson (CPSO#: 80778 )
Business Address: 9917 Tecumseh Rd E
OATC Windsor East
Windsor ON N8R 1A5
(519) 735-6500
Business Address: 1101 University Ave W
OATC Windsor
Windsor ON N9A 5T1
(519) 252-0991
Business Address: 563 Highland Ave
Home Office
Ottawa ON K2A 2J9
6134025742
Business Address: 257 Front Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2Z6
(613) 969-7862
Business Address: Suite 45
49 Chambers Street East
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2Y3
(613) 283-0359
Business Address: 40 Lindsay Street Souh
Lindsay Ontario K9V 2L8
(705) 324-5553
Business Address: 425 Wharncliffe Rd S
London ON N6J 2M6
519-204-8430
Business Address: 7 Hickson Ave
Kingston ON K7K 2N4
Business Address: 1-275 First St
Collingwood ON L9Y 1A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004