THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:21:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Nation River Health Clinic
512 Main Street
Box 519
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137740915
Fax: 6137740916

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Alkan Isserlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Isserlin (CPSO#: 80796 )
Business Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-7962 Extn: 362
Business Address: 512 Main Street
Box 519
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-0915
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Gloucester Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Nation River Health Clinic
512 Main Street
Box 519
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137740915
Fax: 6137740916

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Alkan Isserlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Isserlin (CPSO#: 80796 )
Business Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-7962 Extn: 362
Business Address: 512 Main Street
Box 519
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-0915
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Gloucester Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN ALKAN ISSERLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISSERLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN ALKAN ISSERLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISSERLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004