THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Rue Ducharme
Gatineau QC J8Y 3P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 819-771-0001
Fax: 343-888-2666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation / Blair Hughes Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Blair (CPSO#: 80801 ) Dr. J. Jackson-Hughes (CPSO#: 82611 )
Business Address: 425-1385 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8N4
613-233-6652

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Rue Ducharme
Gatineau QC J8Y 3P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 819-771-0001
Fax: 343-888-2666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation / Blair Hughes Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Blair (CPSO#: 80801 ) Dr. J. Jackson-Hughes (CPSO#: 82611 )
Business Address: 425-1385 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8N4
613-233-6652

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON DONALD BLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON DONALD BLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004