THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 15:08:38 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1910 St. Laurent Blvd
Unit 29
Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
Phone: 613-686-6656
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 15 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tamara Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Henderson (CPSO#: 80810 )
Business Address: 29-1910 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
613-686-6656
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1910 St. Laurent Blvd
Unit 29
Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
Phone: 613-686-6656
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 15 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tamara Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Henderson (CPSO#: 80810 )
Business Address: 29-1910 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
613-686-6656
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA AMY HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA AMY HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004