THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
PRHC Cancer Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-8326
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2225 Lansdowne Street West
Gateway Recovery Centre
Peterborough Ontario K9J 0G5
Phone: (705) 710-2253
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Phone: 905-425-0300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Mar 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Leahy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Leahy (CPSO#: 80827 )
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(905) 430-4055
Business Address: 2225 Lansdowne Street West
Peterborough Ontario K9J 0G5
705-710-2253
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
PRHC Cancer Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-8326
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2225 Lansdowne Street West
Gateway Recovery Centre
Peterborough Ontario K9J 0G5
Phone: (705) 710-2253
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Phone: 905-425-0300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Mar 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Leahy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Leahy (CPSO#: 80827 )
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(905) 430-4055
Business Address: 2225 Lansdowne Street West
Peterborough Ontario K9J 0G5
705-710-2253
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE CHRISTINE LEAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE CHRISTINE LEAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004