THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Family Practice
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519) 941-7060
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Healthcare Centre
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.J. Gucciardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Gucciardi (CPSO#: 80834 )
Business Address: 140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-7575
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Family Practice
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519) 941-7060
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Healthcare Centre
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.J. Gucciardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Gucciardi (CPSO#: 80834 )
Business Address: 140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-7575
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENZA JOSIE GUCCIARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUCCIARDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENZA JOSIE GUCCIARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUCCIARDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004