THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:11:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yanick Ouellet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ouellet (CPSO#: 80837 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yanick Ouellet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ouellet (CPSO#: 80837 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YANICK OUELLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YANICK OUELLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004