THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:28:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Extension: 3100
Fax: (613) 544-0380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yi Ning Strube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Strube (CPSO#: 80840 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2473
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Room JM6-016
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310 Extn: 3100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Extension: 3100
Fax: (613) 544-0380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yi Ning Strube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Strube (CPSO#: 80840 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2473
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Room JM6-016
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310 Extn: 3100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YI NING JOHANNA STRUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YI NING JOHANNA STRUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004