THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Legassie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Legassie (CPSO#: 80841 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Legassie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Legassie (CPSO#: 80841 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNY MARIA LEGASSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGASSIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNY MARIA LEGASSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGASSIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004