THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:16:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 847
904 Ottawa Street
Keewatin Ontario P0X 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 547-2818
Fax: (807) 547-3285
Address: District of Kenora Home for the Age
1220 Valley Drive
Kenora Ontario P9N 2W7
Phone: (807) 468-3165
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Wiebe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 847
904 Ottawa Street
Keewatin Ontario P0X 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 547-2818
Fax: (807) 547-3285
Address: District of Kenora Home for the Age
1220 Valley Drive
Kenora Ontario P9N 2W7
Phone: (807) 468-3165
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Wiebe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON JOAN WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON JOAN WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004