THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fort William Family Health Team
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 626-1212
Fax: (807) 623-8832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirsten Addison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Addison (CPSO#: 80845 )
Business Address: Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
(807) 628-1223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fort William Family Health Team
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 626-1212
Fax: (807) 623-8832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirsten Addison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Addison (CPSO#: 80845 )
Business Address: Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
(807) 628-1223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN MYA LYNN ADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADDISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN MYA LYNN ADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADDISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004