THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:31:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 940
790 Bay St
PO Box 36
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-926-0101
Fax: 416-926-1910
Address: 431 Whitney Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2H6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14 Cannon St West
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2B3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lana Bullock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bullock (CPSO#: 80847 )
Business Address: Suite 940
790 Bay Street
PO Box 36
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 926-0101
Business Address: Womankind Addiction Services
431 Whitney Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2H6
(905) 545-9100
Business Address: Notre Dame House
14 Cannon Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2B3
(905) 308-8090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 940
790 Bay St
PO Box 36
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-926-0101
Fax: 416-926-1910
Address: 431 Whitney Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2H6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14 Cannon St West
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2B3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lana Bullock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bullock (CPSO#: 80847 )
Business Address: Suite 940
790 Bay Street
PO Box 36
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 926-0101
Business Address: Womankind Addiction Services
431 Whitney Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2H6
(905) 545-9100
Business Address: Notre Dame House
14 Cannon Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2B3
(905) 308-8090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANA BULLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANA BULLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004