THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:59:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Shavian Court
London Ontario N6G 3G9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5194332973
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Pop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pop (CPSO#: 80869 )
Business Address: 307 Commissioners Road West
Unit 2
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
(519) 432-0400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Shavian Court
London Ontario N6G 3G9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5194332973
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Pop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pop (CPSO#: 80869 )
Business Address: 307 Commissioners Road West
Unit 2
London Ontario N6J 1Y4
(519) 432-0400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANCA POP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANCA POP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2004