THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:14:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WRH - Ouellette Campus
Dept of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie St Clair Clinic - RAAM
15 John Street
Leamington Ontario N8H 1H1
Phone: 519-326-7742
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie St Clair Clinic RAAM
1574 Lincoln Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 2J4
Phone: 519-977-9772
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Dept of Emergency Medicine
1995 Len Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9W 1L9
Phone: (519) 985-2606
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donald M. Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Levy (CPSO#: 80871 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital - Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Erie St. Clair RAAM Clinic
15 John Street
Leamington Ontario N8H 1H1
(519) 326-7742
Business Address: Erie St. Clair RAAM Clinic
1574 Lincoln Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 2J4
(519) 977-9772
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WRH - Ouellette Campus
Dept of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie St Clair Clinic - RAAM
15 John Street
Leamington Ontario N8H 1H1
Phone: 519-326-7742
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie St Clair Clinic RAAM
1574 Lincoln Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 2J4
Phone: 519-977-9772
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Dept of Emergency Medicine
1995 Len Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9W 1L9
Phone: (519) 985-2606
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donald M. Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Levy (CPSO#: 80871 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital - Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Erie St. Clair RAAM Clinic
15 John Street
Leamington Ontario N8H 1H1
(519) 326-7742
Business Address: Erie St. Clair RAAM Clinic
1574 Lincoln Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 2J4
(519) 977-9772
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD MICHAEL LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD MICHAEL LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2004