THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:26:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Rajput Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rajput (CPSO#: 80876 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Rajput Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rajput (CPSO#: 80876 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANSHU RAJPUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJPUT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANSHU RAJPUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJPUT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004