THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:34:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
2437 Princess St
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 344-1365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aspy Di Quinzio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Di Quinzio (CPSO#: 80929 ) Dr. W. Aspy (CPSO#: 80978 )
Business Address: 200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G1
(613) 546-6652

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
2437 Princess St
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 344-1365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aspy Di Quinzio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Di Quinzio (CPSO#: 80929 ) Dr. W. Aspy (CPSO#: 80978 )
Business Address: 200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G1
(613) 546-6652

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE DI QUINZIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI QUINZIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE DI QUINZIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI QUINZIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004