THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:31:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics, Room 369
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Fax: (416) 756-6152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics, Room 369
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Fax: (416) 756-6152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLARE MARY HUTCHINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLARE MARY HUTCHINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004