THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:09:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Nov 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oren Shemtov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Shemtov (CPSO#: 80966 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Nov 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oren Shemtov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Shemtov (CPSO#: 80966 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OREN MICHAEL SHEMTOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEMTOV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OREN MICHAEL SHEMTOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEMTOV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004