THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 960 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-633-7686
Fax: 905-633-8678

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Shayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shayan (CPSO#: 80970 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 960 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-633-7686
Fax: 905-633-8678

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Shayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shayan (CPSO#: 80970 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER JOSEPH SHAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER JOSEPH SHAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004