THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:05:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 6035
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davidson (CPSO#: 80975 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine- Room 8-207
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3538

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 6035
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davidson (CPSO#: 80975 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine- Room 8-207
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3538

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MALCOLM DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MALCOLM DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004