THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:44:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 139 Greenbank Road
Suite 107
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 680-7602
Fax: (613) 680-7601
Address: 2725 Queensview Dr #400, Ottawa, ON
Ottawa Ontario K2B 0A1
Phone: (613) 226-6200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4312 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K4A 5E6
Phone: 6138376644
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lamia Wassef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wassef (CPSO#: 80979 )
Business Address: Suite 107
139 Greenbank Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 9A5
(613) 680-7602

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 139 Greenbank Road
Suite 107
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 680-7602
Fax: (613) 680-7601
Address: 2725 Queensview Dr #400, Ottawa, ON
Ottawa Ontario K2B 0A1
Phone: (613) 226-6200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4312 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K4A 5E6
Phone: 6138376644
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lamia Wassef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wassef (CPSO#: 80979 )
Business Address: Suite 107
139 Greenbank Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 9A5
(613) 680-7602

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAMIA FIKRY FOUAD WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAMIA FIKRY FOUAD WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2004