THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:55:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 London Rd
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 337-5600
Fax: (519) 337-0439

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanie Crozier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crozier (CPSO#: 81006 )
Business Address: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
(519) 337-5600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 London Rd
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 337-5600
Fax: (519) 337-0439

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanie Crozier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crozier (CPSO#: 81006 )
Business Address: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
(519) 337-5600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE ANDREA CROZIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROZIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE ANDREA CROZIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROZIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004