THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:55:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 466-1311
Fax: (416) 466-9629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karoon Carole Danayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Danayan (CPSO#: 81007 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7476
Business Address: Suite 100
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 466-1311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 466-1311
Fax: (416) 466-9629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karoon Carole Danayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Danayan (CPSO#: 81007 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7476
Business Address: Suite 100
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 466-1311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAROON CAROLE DANAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANAYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAROON CAROLE DANAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANAYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004