THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055085911
Fax: 9055082972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anita Dunn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dunn (CPSO#: 81011 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Level 2
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-8011
Business Address: Suite 101
Building A
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 883-2133

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055085911
Fax: 9055082972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anita Dunn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dunn (CPSO#: 81011 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Level 2
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-8011
Business Address: Suite 101
Building A
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 883-2133

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA YEE-TING DUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA YEE-TING DUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004