THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:54:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055085911
Fax: 9055082972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edwin Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fong (CPSO#: 22125 ) Dr. E. Fong (CPSO#: 81014 )
Business Address: 101-9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 883-1212 Extn: 2106
Business Address: 205-250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 508-5911
Business Address: 201-13291 Yonge Street
2nd Floor
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 883-1212 Extn: 5939
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2310
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 853-2216
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4Z3
9058834554

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055085911
Fax: 9055082972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edwin Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fong (CPSO#: 22125 ) Dr. E. Fong (CPSO#: 81014 )
Business Address: 101-9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 883-1212 Extn: 2106
Business Address: 205-250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 508-5911
Business Address: 201-13291 Yonge Street
2nd Floor
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 883-1212 Extn: 5939
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2310
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 853-2216
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4Z3
9058834554

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWIN MATTHEW Y.C. FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWIN MATTHEW Y.C. FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004