THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:06:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103 P O Box 790
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-7956
Fax: (705) 526-6287
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R4P4
Phone: 705 526 1300
Extension: 1501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey M. Golisky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Golisky (CPSO#: 81015 )
Business Address: Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
PO BOX 790
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-7956
Business Address: 1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300 Extn: 1501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103 P O Box 790
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-7956
Fax: (705) 526-6287
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R4P4
Phone: 705 526 1300
Extension: 1501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey M. Golisky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Golisky (CPSO#: 81015 )
Business Address: Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
PO BOX 790
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-7956
Business Address: 1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300 Extn: 1501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY MARK GOLISKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLISKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY MARK GOLISKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLISKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004