THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: Goto, Aya (Used Until: 06 Apr 2005)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-2048
Fax: (613) 623-6719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aya Suzuki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suzuki (CPSO#: 81016 )
Business Address: Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-2048

General Information

Former Name: Goto, Aya (Used Until: 06 Apr 2005)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-2048
Fax: (613) 623-6719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aya Suzuki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suzuki (CPSO#: 81016 )
Business Address: Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-2048

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYA SUZUKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUZUKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYA SUZUKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUZUKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004