THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:15:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 727 Jane St.
Toronto Ontario M6N 4B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 763-8880
Fax: (416) 763-3444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kennedy (CPSO#: 81022 )
Business Address: 727 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4B3
(416) 763-8880

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 727 Jane St.
Toronto Ontario M6N 4B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 763-8880
Fax: (416) 763-3444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kennedy (CPSO#: 81022 )
Business Address: 727 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4B3
(416) 763-8880

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH DOUGLAS KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH DOUGLAS KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004