THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:27:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: Krishnadev, Nupura (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Bakshi, Nupura Krisnadev (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vista Eye Centre
2425 Bloor St West, Suite 513
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Toronto Ontario G6V4Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167608763
Fax: 6476892276
Address: St Michael's Health Ctr Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3688
Address: Mount Sinai Eye Clinic
60 Murray Street
Rm. L1-001
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 5151
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
8th floor, Donnelly Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B1W8
Phone: (416) 867-3734
Fax: (416) 867-3672
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Ophthalmology
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6118
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nupura K. Bakshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bakshi (CPSO#: 81025 )
Business Address: 2425 Bloor St W
Suite 513
Toronto Ontario G6V4Z2
4167608763
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
Suite 1-001
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 5151
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4M3
(905) 456-3937
Business Address: St Michael's Health Ctr Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-7422
Business Address: Prism Eye Institute Brampton
605 - 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4M3
(905) 456-3937

General Information

Former Name: Krishnadev, Nupura (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Bakshi, Nupura Krisnadev (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vista Eye Centre
2425 Bloor St West, Suite 513
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Toronto Ontario G6V4Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167608763
Fax: 6476892276
Address: St Michael's Health Ctr Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3688
Address: Mount Sinai Eye Clinic
60 Murray Street
Rm. L1-001
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 5151
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
8th floor, Donnelly Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B1W8
Phone: (416) 867-3734
Fax: (416) 867-3672
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Ophthalmology
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6118
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nupura K. Bakshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bakshi (CPSO#: 81025 )
Business Address: 2425 Bloor St W
Suite 513
Toronto Ontario G6V4Z2
4167608763
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
Suite 1-001
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 5151
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4M3
(905) 456-3937
Business Address: St Michael's Health Ctr Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-7422
Business Address: Prism Eye Institute Brampton
605 - 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4M3
(905) 456-3937

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NUPURA KRISHNADEV BAKSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKSHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NUPURA KRISHNADEV BAKSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKSHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 20 Feb 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On February 20, 2018, the Maryland State Board of Physicians, with the agreement of Dr. Nupura Krishnadev (Bakshi), made a Consent Order finding that Dr. Krishnadev had not obtained all of the continuing medical education credits required under Maryland law contrary to the affirmation she signed in her renewal application that she had completed them. The Consent Order ordered Dr. Krishnadev to pay a fine of U.S.$900 and to obtain all of the required and outstanding education credits. The Maryland State Board of Physicians filed another Order on March 27, 2018 stating that the terms and conditions of the Consent Order had been satisfied. The College was notified of this finding by a report on April 10, 2018. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 20 Feb 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On February 20, 2018, the Maryland State Board of Physicians, with the agreement of Dr. Nupura Krishnadev (Bakshi), made a Consent Order finding that Dr. Krishnadev had not obtained all of the continuing medical education credits required under Maryland law contrary to the affirmation she signed in her renewal application that she had completed them. The Consent Order ordered Dr. Krishnadev to pay a fine of U.S.$900 and to obtain all of the required and outstanding education credits. The Maryland State Board of Physicians filed another Order on March 27, 2018 stating that the terms and conditions of the Consent Order had been satisfied. The College was notified of this finding by a report on April 10, 2018. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004