THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:25:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6235
Fax: (416) 530-6656

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 06 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rania Lingas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lingas (CPSO#: 81034 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B9
(416) 530-6235

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6235
Fax: (416) 530-6656

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 06 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rania Lingas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lingas (CPSO#: 81034 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B9
(416) 530-6235

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANIA IRENE LINGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANIA IRENE LINGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004