THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:33:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2 109
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4210
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William A. Look Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Look Hong (CPSO#: 31787 ) Dr. N. Look Hong (CPSO#: 81038 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
905-895-4521 Extn: 2904

Corporation Name: Nicole Look Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Look Hong (CPSO#: 81038 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite T2 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5000 Extn: 3255

Corporation Name: William A. Look Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2 109
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4210
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William A. Look Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Look Hong (CPSO#: 31787 ) Dr. N. Look Hong (CPSO#: 81038 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
905-895-4521 Extn: 2904

Corporation Name: Nicole Look Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Look Hong (CPSO#: 81038 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite T2 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5000 Extn: 3255

Corporation Name: William A. Look Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE JANELLE LOOK HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOOK HONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE JANELLE LOOK HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOOK HONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004