THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:17:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Critical Care Program
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 7471
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bridge Maslove Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Maslove (CPSO#: 81044 ) Dr. S. Bridge (CPSO#: 83160 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Critical Care Program
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Critical Care Program
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 7471
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bridge Maslove Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Maslove (CPSO#: 81044 ) Dr. S. Bridge (CPSO#: 83160 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Critical Care Program
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MATTHEW MASLOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASLOVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MATTHEW MASLOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASLOVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004