THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 14:06:27 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6810
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Champlain Drive
Toronto Ontario M3H 2X1
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Address: 4001 Leslie St
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weinberg and Tamir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weinberg (CPSO#: 81057 ) Dr. D. Tamir (CPSO#: 78015 )
Business Address: 1255 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E2
(416) 498-0002
Business Address: 3rd Floor
Room 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 848-7665
Business Address: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia & Pain Management
EN 3-464- 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-5164
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6810
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Champlain Drive
Toronto Ontario M3H 2X1
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Address: 4001 Leslie St
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weinberg and Tamir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weinberg (CPSO#: 81057 ) Dr. D. Tamir (CPSO#: 78015 )
Business Address: 1255 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E2
(416) 498-0002
Business Address: 3rd Floor
Room 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 848-7665
Business Address: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia & Pain Management
EN 3-464- 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-5164
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EITAN WEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EITAN WEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 May 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 May 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004