THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:03:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
491 Eglington Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 787-5511
Fax: (416) 787-1592
Address: OTOHNS Department
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Champagne Centre
Unit B17
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 645-1978

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xerxes Punthakee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Punthakee (CPSO#: 81066 )
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160
Business Address: 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 787-5511
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8533

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
491 Eglington Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 787-5511
Fax: (416) 787-1592
Address: OTOHNS Department
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Champagne Centre
Unit B17
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 645-1978

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xerxes Punthakee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Punthakee (CPSO#: 81066 )
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160
Business Address: 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 787-5511
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8533

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XERXES DINSHAW PUNTHAKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNTHAKEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XERXES DINSHAW PUNTHAKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNTHAKEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004