THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 901 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474276001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahim (CPSO#: 81068 )
Business Address: Downtown Toronto Doctors
Suite 630
790 Bay Street
P O Box 70
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(647) 427-6001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 901 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474276001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahim (CPSO#: 81068 )
Business Address: Downtown Toronto Doctors
Suite 630
790 Bay Street
P O Box 70
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(647) 427-6001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALYA RAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALYA RAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004