THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:01:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charleton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 38510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
89 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9B 4V8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Ambulatory Health Services
2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 5E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Healey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Healey (CPSO#: 81085 )
Business Address: 2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4E5
(905) 521-1155
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 492-2120
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 483 Bay Street South Tower
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C9
(800) 263-2833

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charleton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 38510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
89 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9B 4V8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Ambulatory Health Services
2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 5E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Healey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Healey (CPSO#: 81085 )
Business Address: 2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4E5
(905) 521-1155
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 492-2120
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 483 Bay Street South Tower
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C9
(800) 263-2833

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOSEPH HEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOSEPH HEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004