THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:59:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hogle, Karen Louise (Used Until: 21 Jun 2004)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Tri City Colonoscopy Clinics
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Leone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leone (CPSO#: 81090 )
Business Address: 200 - 50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
(519) 650-2777
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Waterloo Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

General Information

Former Name: Hogle, Karen Louise (Used Until: 21 Jun 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Tri City Colonoscopy Clinics
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Leone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leone (CPSO#: 81090 )
Business Address: 200 - 50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
(519) 650-2777
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Waterloo Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE LEONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE LEONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004