THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 247 Simcoe Street North
Suite 301
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-725-1596
Fax: 905-725-3900
Address: 3100-222 King St E
Advance Endoscopy and Specialist Centre
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 9054197007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 305 Milner Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1B 3V4
Phone: 4163213883
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marilyn Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li (CPSO#: 81103 )
Business Address: 247 Simcoe Street North
suite 301
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T5
Business Address: 44 St Joseph St
apt 2014
Toronto ON M4Y 2W4
705-874-1517
Business Address: Lbby-707 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 2X5
705-874-1517

Corporation Name: Marilyn Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 247 Simcoe Street North
Suite 301
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-725-1596
Fax: 905-725-3900
Address: 3100-222 King St E
Advance Endoscopy and Specialist Centre
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 9054197007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 305 Milner Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1B 3V4
Phone: 4163213883
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marilyn Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li (CPSO#: 81103 )
Business Address: 247 Simcoe Street North
suite 301
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T5
Business Address: 44 St Joseph St
apt 2014
Toronto ON M4Y 2W4
705-874-1517
Business Address: Lbby-707 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 2X5
705-874-1517

Corporation Name: Marilyn Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARILYN MAN-YEE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARILYN MAN-YEE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004