THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:32:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Tecnologica De Santiago, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1736 Wyandotte Street West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 256-8000
Fax: 519-256-4707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Jun 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Valaris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Valaris (CPSO#: 81113 )
Business Address: 1736 Wyandotte Street West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1J1
(519) 256-8000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Tecnologica De Santiago, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1736 Wyandotte Street West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 256-8000
Fax: 519-256-4707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Jun 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Valaris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Valaris (CPSO#: 81113 )
Business Address: 1736 Wyandotte Street West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1J1
(519) 256-8000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Jul 2008
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 30 2008
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Georgios Valaris may practise paediatrics only, in ambulatory and community
setting.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Georgios Valaris may practise paediatrics only, in ambulatory and community
setting.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Tecnologica De Santiago, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2004