THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:44:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167473400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
Radiology
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167104277
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Mongiardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mongiardi (CPSO#: 81117 ) Dr. D. Bruno (CPSO#: 79300 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167473400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
Radiology
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167104277
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Mongiardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mongiardi (CPSO#: 81117 ) Dr. D. Bruno (CPSO#: 79300 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER NICHOLAS MONGIARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGIARDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER NICHOLAS MONGIARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGIARDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004