THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 03:37:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovaird Drive East, Unit 303
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)-792-6223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charanjit Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sandhu (CPSO#: 81125 )
Business Address: 303-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 792-6223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovaird Drive East, Unit 303
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)-792-6223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charanjit Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sandhu (CPSO#: 81125 )
Business Address: 303-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 792-6223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARANJIT SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARANJIT SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004