THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:02:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital, LHSC
Paediatric Emergency Department
Room E4-211
800 Commissionaers Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58134
Fax: (519) 667-6769

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.S. Sangha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sangha (CPSO#: 81126 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital, LHSC
Paediatric Emergency Department
Room E4-211
800 Commissionaers Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58134
Fax: (519) 667-6769

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.S. Sangha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sangha (CPSO#: 81126 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURINDER SINGH SANGHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURINDER SINGH SANGHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004